IL HJR0059 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-SEVENTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when House of Representatives adjourns on Wednesday, February 1, 2012, it stands adjourned until Friday, February 3, 2012, in perfunctory session, or until the call of the Speaker; and when it adjourns on that day it stands adjourned until Monday, February 6, 2012, in perfunctory session, or until the call of the Speaker; and when it adjourns on that day it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 7, 2012, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and when the Senate adjourns on Wednesday, February 1, 2012, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 7, 2012, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.; 3-6(a) |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-01-31 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=59&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJR/09700HJ0059.htm |