IL HJR0053 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Illinois Route 111 from New Poag Road to Madison Avenue as "The Chief Todd Werner Memorial Highway".
Title
CHIEF TODD WERNER MEMORIAL HWY
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Resolution Adopted 102-000-000 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-03-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-09-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |