IL HJR0051 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates South Side Drive in Decatur from Route 51 to Route 48 as the "Officer Chris Oberheim Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

C. OBERHEIM MEMORIAL HIGHWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2022-03-22SenateReferred to Assignments
2022-03-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2022-03-22SenateArrive in Senate
2022-03-15HouseResolution Adopted 112-000-000
2022-01-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2022-01-11HouseRecommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2021-11-29HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2021-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2021-10-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-10-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2021-10-27HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-000-000
2021-10-27HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2021-10-27HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris
2021-10-27HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2021-09-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-08-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback