IL HJR0049 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-20 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-20 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 22, 2019 "Sisters of the Resurrection Day" in Illinois.
Title
SISTERS OF RESURRECTION DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-04-03 | House | Remains in State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |