IL HJR0045 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDRED FIRST GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, March 14, 2019, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 19, 2019, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 19, 2019, or until the call of the President.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseAdopted Both Houses
2019-03-14SenateResolution Adopted
2019-03-14SenatePrevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
2019-03-14SenateMoved to Suspend Rule Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford; 3-6(a)
2019-03-14SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-14SenateArrive in Senate
2019-03-13HouseResolution Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback