IL HJR0045 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a Task Force to investigate how to retrofit 3 public schools in the State of Illinois to achieve Leadership in Energy and Environmental Design (LEED) certification.
Title
LEED CERTIFICATION TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Karen May [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-10-29 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-29 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2009-10-29 | Resolution Adopted; 058-000-000 | |
2009-10-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions October 29, 2009 | |
2009-10-28 | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 | |
2009-10-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-07-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-06-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-06-24 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-06-24 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Resolution Adopted as Amended 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-05-06 | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Environment & Energy Committee; 014-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Environment & Energy Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen May |