IL HJR0044 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDRED FIRST GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, March 7, 2019, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 12, 2019, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 12, 2019, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Terry Link; 3-6(a) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=44&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0044.htm |