IL HJR0039 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Illinois 133 in Oakland as the "Lieutenant Jared W. Southworth Memorial Highway".
Title
LT. SOUTHWORTH MEMORIAL HGHY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-25 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-25 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-05-02 | House | Resolution Adopted 110-000-000 |
2024-05-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-03-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 015-000-000 |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |