IL HJR0038 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-26 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the new Chester Bridge over the Mississippi River along Illinois Route 150 and Missouri Route 51 as the "Don Welge Memorial Bridge".
Title
DON WELGE MEMORIAL BRIDGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-26 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Motion in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-10-26 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-24 | House | Resolution Adopted 101-000-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 017-000-000 |
2023-05-12 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |