IL HJR0037 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of U.S. Route 50 from Lawrenceville, Illinois, to the Indiana border as the "Trevor Pinnick Memorial Highway".
Title
TREVOR PINNICK MEMORIAL HWY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-05-29 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 117-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2013-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |
2013-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2013-05-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 017-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2013-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2013-05-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad E. Halbrook |