IL HJR0037 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honors the Hemophilia Foundation of Illinois for its 60 years of dedicated, outstanding service to the Illinois bleeding disorder community and once again recognizes and commemorates the month of March as Hemophilia Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
HEMOPHILIA AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2009-05-28 | Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions | |
2009-05-28 | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-05 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-05-05 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-04-22 | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |