IL HJR0036 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designates Interstate 55 as it travels from the Tri-State Tollway to East St. Louis as the "Barack Obama Presidential Expressway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

I55-PRES. OBAMA EXPRESSWAY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-04 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Motion in House (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 36 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-04HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-07-04SenateResolution Adopted; 049-000-000
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-06-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions July 1, 2017
2017-06-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-06-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-06-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-06-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-06-26HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 063-010-001
2017-06-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-06-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-28HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 006-005-000
2017-03-28HouseReported Back To Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee;
2017-03-28HouseRecommends Be Adopted Subcommittee/ Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 002-001-000
2017-03-16HouseTo Highways & Transit Subcommittee
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-02-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback