IL HJR0035 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Illinois Route 251 from Bridge Street in Roscoe to Rockton Road in Roscoe as the Specialist Brandon Jacob Rowe Memorial Highway.
Title
SPC BRANDON ROWE MEM HGHWY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-05-29 | House | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-05-11 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |