IL HJR0035 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-09 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Secretary of State's Advisory Committee on Traffic Safety to look at all aspects of traffic safety in an effort to determine legislative and administrative action that can be taken to lower the number of traffic-related fatalities in Illinois.
Title
TRAFFIC SAFETY ADVISORY COMM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-09 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 051-000-000 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 9, 2011 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 007-000-000 |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-05-31 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-002-001 |
2011-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed |
2011-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-29 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2011-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D'Amico |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=35&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJR/09700HJ0035.htm |