IL HJR0028 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Interstate 64 in Wayne County from Mile Post 112 to 116 as the "Deputy Sean Riley Memorial Highway".
Title
DEPUTY SEAN RILEY MEM. HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - House - Motion in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-18 | House | Resolution Adopted 114-000-000 |
2023-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 014-000-000 |
2023-05-08 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |