IL HJR0026 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Resolution Adopted 116-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the portion of U.S. Route 41 within the State of Illinois as a part of the Purple Heart Trail that exists throughout the U.S. highway system.
Title
ILLINOIS PURPLE HEART TRAIL
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Charles Jefferson [D] |
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - Motion in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Resolution Adopted 116-000-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-04-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-10 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2013-04-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 017-000-000 |
2013-03-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-03-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |