IL HJR0026 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 108-005-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 108-005-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a bipartisan task force that shall hold public hearings, gather evidence, develop, and propose legislation and ultimately furnish a report concerning business and job development in Illinois.
Title
TASK FORCE-JOBS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Resolution Adopted as Amended 108-005-000 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-04-29 | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Labor Committee; 022-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Labor Committee | |
2009-03-16 | Assigned to Labor Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller |