IL HJR0025 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Illinois Route 143 as it travels from its intersection with Route 4 east through the City of Marine as the "Larry D. Mills Memorial Highway".
Title
LARRY MILLS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Resolution Adopted 113-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |