IL HJR0024 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

That the P-20 Council, in collaboration with the Early Learning Council, shall establish an Advisory Committee for the purposes of reviewing kindergarten transitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

KINDERGARTEN ADVISE COMMITTEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateResolution Adopted; 051-001-000
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-24SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-05-19SenateAssigned to Education
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-05-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-11SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-11HouseResolution Adopted 111-000-000
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-29HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback