IL HJR0024 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the I-70 Mississippi River Bridge connecting Illinois to Missouri currently under construction, upon approval of the Illinois and Missouri State legislatures, as the Veterans Memorial Bridge.
Title
VETERANS MEMORIAL BRIDGE
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] |
Sen. James Clayborne [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 059-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 29, 2013 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-30 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-04-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-04-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 109-000-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2013-04-09 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 017-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-03-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |