IL HJR0024 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to continue funding victim assistance and compensation programs and programs for victim service providers through the Victims of Crime Act Fund.
Title
VICTIM ASSISTANCE-FED FUNDING
Sponsors
Rep. Sandy Cole [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Coulson [R] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Rep. Darlene Senger [R] | Rep. Ronald Wait [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-04-30 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-30 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-04-30 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-04-23 | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-16 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=24&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJR/09600HJ0024.htm |