IL HJR0019 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Resolution Adopted 112-002-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Resolution Adopted 112-002-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Farmers' Markets, the purpose of which is to review the implementation of Acts that define which products and practices are permitted and which products and practices are not permitted at farmers' markets and other outdoor food sale events.
Title
TASK FORCE ON FARMERS' MARKETS
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-002-001 |
2011-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-05-11 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |