IL HJR0018 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Senior Financial Exploitation Task Force to study the problem of financial exploitation of at-risk elderly adults in Illinois.
Title
SR FINANCIAL EXPLOITATION TF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Silvana Tabares |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=18&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0018.htm |