IL HJR0014 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Wednesday, January 25, 2017, it stands adjourned until Friday, January 27, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, January 31, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Friday, February 03, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, February 6, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 8, 2017, or until the call of the Speaker; and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, January 26, 2017, it stands adjourned until Monday, January 30, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 07, 2017, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Don Harmon; 3-6(a) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-01-24 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=14&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0014.htm |