IL HJR0011 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Boards and Commissions Advisory Panel for the purpose of conducting an exhaustive analysis of all statutorily created advisory panels, authorities, boards, commissions, committees, councils, and task forces to determine where cost savings may be made.
Title
BOARDS COMMS ADVISORY PANEL
Sponsors
Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Harry Ramey [R] | Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-31 | House | Resolution Adopted 110-000-000 |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-03-31 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-000 |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2011-02-23 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |