IL HJR0010 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Senior Drivers Safety Task Force to study safety issues seniors face while driving in Illinois.
Title
SENIOR DRIVERS SAFETY TF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=10&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0010.htm |