IL HJR0008 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Old U.S. 50 in Clinton County as the "Clinton County Veterans Memorial Road".
Title
CLINTON CTY VETS MEMORIAL ROAD
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] |
Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-04-18 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-001 |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-03-14 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |