IL HJR0007 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the College Insurance Program Task Force to study the College Insurance Program and present policy and legislative recommendations to the General Assembly to ensure the program remains a viable and healthy benefit.
Title
COLLEGE INSURANCE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Resolution Adopted 109-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-03-22 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 008-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2023-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2023-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael T. Marron |