IL HJR0004 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-07 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-07 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the new Interstate 70 expressway from its connection to the existing Interstate 64 up to the new Mississippi River Bridge connecting East St. Louis and downtown St. Louis, Missouri as the US Congressman Jerry F. Costello Expressway.
Title
JERRY F. COSTELLO EXPRESSWAY
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-11-07 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-07 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 050-000-000 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 7, 2013 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-02-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-02-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-02-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-02-27 | House | Resolution Adopted 117-000-001 |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2013-02-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 016-000-000 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |