IL HJR0003 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Trade Policy Task Force within the Illinois Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity - Office of Trade and Investment to (1) analyze important issues relative to the growth of international trade from and to Illinois; (2) make recommendations to Congress, the United States Trade Representative, and the White House National Trade Council regarding trade policies that best serve Illinois; and (3) promote the exportation of goods and services from Illinois and the importation of goods and services into Illinois.
Title
TRADE POLICY TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] | Rep. Keith Sommer [R] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] |
Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2017-06-27 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-000-000 |
2017-06-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-06-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-06-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended 056-000-000 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Be Adopted Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Resolution Adopted 115-001-000 |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-02-23 | House | Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-06 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-02-06 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2017-02-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |