IL HB6858 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-01 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Enterprise Zone Act. Provides that an Enterprise Zone may be extended for an additional 20 years upon application by the corporate authorities of the county or municipality that designated the Enterprise Zone. Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act and the Public Utilities Act to make conforming changes in provisions concerning tax exemptions for businesses located in Enterprise Zones.
Title
ENTERPRISE ZONE-EXTEND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2010-06-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-06-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-05-25 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 068-048-000 | |
2010-05-25 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-05-25 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-04-28 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-28 | First Reading | |
2010-04-28 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6858&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB6858.htm |