IL HB6749 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $3,400,000, or so much of that amount as may be necessary, from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for the purpose of creating a contingency allotment for reimbursing sellers who participated in the Department's Retail Energy Efficiency Appliance Program. Effective April 1, 2010.
Title
$DCEO-APPLIANCE PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-06 | Postponed - Appropriations II | |
2010-04-28 | Postponed - Appropriations II | |
2010-04-22 | Postponed - Appropriations II | |
2010-04-15 | Postponed - Appropriations II | |
2010-04-13 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Appropriations II | |
2010-04-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-030-000 | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 005-002-000 | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael K. Smith |