IL HB6615 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, all handgun ammunition that is manufactured, imported into the State for sale or personal use, kept for sale, offered or exposed for sale, sold, given, lent, or possessed shall be serialized. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, any person who manufactures, causes to be manufactured, imports into the State for sale or personal use, keeps for sale, offers or exposes for sale, or who gives or lends any handgun ammunition that is not serialized is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, any person who possesses in any public place any handgun ammunition that is not serialized is guilty of a Class C misdemeanor. Provides exceptions. Provides that beginning January 1, 2018, the Department of State Police shall maintain a centralized registry of all reports of handgun ammunition transactions reported to the Department in a manner prescribed by the Department. Provides that information in the registry, upon proper application for that information, shall be furnished to peace officers and authorized employees of the Department of State Police or to the person listed in the registry as the owner of the particular handgun ammunition. Provides that the Department of State Police shall adopt rules relating to the assessment and collection of end-user fees in an amount not to exceed $0.005 per round of handgun ammunition or per bullet, in which the accumulated fee amount may not exceed the cost to pay for the infrastructure, implementation, operational, enforcement, and future development costs of these provisions. Effective January 1, 2018, except some provisions effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-HANDGUN AMMO-SERIALIZE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2016-11-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2016-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2016-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2016-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2016-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2016-11-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2016-11-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2016-11-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
2016-11-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2016-11-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-11-02HouseFirst Reading
2016-10-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720524-0.05New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.10New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.11New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.12New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-1.9New CodeSee Bill Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-4Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback