IL HB6614 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Public Transportation Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Use Tax Act, and the Service Use Tax Act. Beginning July 1, 2017, instead of use and occupation tax collections being deposited into the General Revenue Fund and then transferred monthly by the Comptroller from the General Revenue Fund to the Downstate Public Transportation Fund, requires the Department of Revenue to deposit the designated fraction of the net revenue realized from those collections directly into the Downstate Public Transportation Fund. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
DOWNSTATE PUB TRANS FUNDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-11-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-10-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-10-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-10-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 740 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6614&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6614.htm |