IL HB6594 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. In a provision concerning the maximum total amount of unemployment benefits, provides that with respect to any benefit year beginning on or after December 1, 2015 and prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act, any otherwise eligible individual whose total or partial unemployment is attributable to his or her employer's temporary idling of a steelmaking facility shall be entitled, during such benefit year, to a maximum total amount of benefits equal to 52 times his or her weekly benefit amount plus dependents' allowances, or to the total wages for insured work paid to such individual during the individual's base period, whichever amount is smaller. Effective immediately.
Title
UNEMPLOYMNT BENEFIT-MAX AMOUNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-15 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-11-09 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-11-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-02 | House | First Reading |
2016-07-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-07-07 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-07-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6594&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6594.htm |