IL HB6583 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations from specified funds to the Illinois State Board of Education for grants, programs, and ordinary expenses for FY17. Effective immediately.
Title
$ISBE FY17
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2016-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2016-06-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2016-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-05-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-05-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6583&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/PDF/09900HB6583.pdf |