IL HB6321 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Electronic Products Recycling and Reuse Act. Provides that accreditation is not required for facilities that place cathode ray tube (CRT) glass in storage cells for future retrieval in accordance with specified provisions of the Act. Provides that any organization that accredits facilities pursuant to this Section is prohibited from penalizing or taking other negative actions against any recycler, refurbisher, or collector of CEDs and EEDs based on the recycler's, refurbisher's, or collector's use of a facility that places CRT glass in storage cells for future retrieval in accordance with specified provisions of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
ELECTRONIC RECYCLE-ACCREDIT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 010-000-002 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 017-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 150 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |