IL HB6301 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Contains provisions concerning court ordered refunds of health insurance premiums paid by annuitants, survivors, or retired employees under the provisions of Public Act 97-695. Requires the Director of Central Management Services to certify to the State Comptroller and the State Treasurer the amount to be paid to each annuitant, survivor, or retired employee. Requires the State Comptroller and the State Treasurer to transfer the certified amount from the Health Insurance Reserve Fund to the State Retiree Health Insurance Premium Return Fund. Creates the State Retiree Health Insurance Premium Return Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used, subject to appropriation, to refund health insurance premiums paid by annuitants, survivors, or retired employees as provided in the court order. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE EMPL GROUP INS-RETIREE
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Poe [R] | Rep. Rich Brauer [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] |
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-11-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-11-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2014-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-09-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-09-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5l | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6301&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB6301.htm |