IL HB6298 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Authorizes the Board of Trustees of the Fund to lend securities owned by the Fund to a borrower upon such terms and conditions as may be mutually agreed upon. Requires the agreement to provide that during the period of the loan the Fund shall retain the right to receive, or collect from the borrower, all dividends, interest rights, or any distributions to which the Fund would have otherwise been entitled. Provides that the borrower shall deposit with the Fund, as collateral, cash equal to the market value of the securities at the time the loan is made and shall increase the amount of collateral if and when the Fund requests an additional amount because of subsequent increased market value of the securities. Provides that the period for which the securities may be loaned shall not exceed one year, and the loan agreement may specify earlier termination by either party upon mutually agreed conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-CHI FIRE-LEND SECURITIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 85 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0786 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2016 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 085-033-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-004-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-001 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-001-000 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-002-000 |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-001-000 |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |