IL HB6286 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Re-creates the Comprehensive Regional Planning Fund. Provides a continuing appropriation of $5,000,000 adjusted for inflation from the General Revenue Fund to the Fund. Directs the Department of Transportation to annually distribute moneys received in the Fund without appropriation according to a specified formula. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPREHENSIVE REG PLAN-FUND
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Moeller [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-03-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |