IL HB6280 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $773,000 from the Underground Storage Tank Fund to the Environmental Protection Agency for case processing of leaking underground storage tank permit and claims appeals. Appropriates $2,600,000 from the U.S. Environmental Protection Fund to the Environmental Protection Agency for the Underground Storage Tank Program. Appropriates $60,100,000 from the Underground Storage Tank Fund to the Environmental Protection Agency for contracts for site remediation and for reimbursements to eligible owners/operators of leaking underground storage tanks, including claims submitted in prior years. Effective immediately.
Title
$EPA-LUST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2016-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2016-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2016-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-02-11 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-02-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-02-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-02-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-02-11 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6280&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/PDF/09900HB6280.pdf |