IL HB6278 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates the Digital Divide Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall conduct a study and prepare a report regarding access to computers, telecommunications technologies, and related training by disadvantaged communities. Sets forth membership. Permits the Task Force to call upon any department, agency, institution, or officer of the State or any political subdivision of the State for facilities, data, or other assistance. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to provide technical assistance and administrative and staffing support to the Task Force. Requires the Task Force to submit its report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015. Repeals the Task Force on December 31, 2016. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-DIGITAL DIVIDE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-27 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6278&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB6278.htm |