IL HB6149 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0814
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0814
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Illinois Veterans' Homes Fund as a special fund in the State Treasury. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to allow for the issuance of decals by Illinois Veterans' Homes. Provides for the original fee, renewal fees, and fee distribution for Universal special license plates with decals issued by Illinois Veterans' Homes.
Title
VEH CD-VETERANS' HOMES PLATES
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] |
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0814 |
2016-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.875 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |