IL HB6146 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows municipal owned snow plows, road graders, backhoes, and front-end loaders to have amber and blue oscillating, rotating, or flashing lights.
Title
VEH CD-BLUE/AMBER LIGHTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Tabled |
2016-04-05 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2016-03-29 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6146&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6146.htm |