IL HB6141 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that when a court appearance is required for an alleged violation of the Criminal Code of 1961, the Illinois Vehicle Code, the Wildlife Code, the Fish and Aquatic Life Code, the Child Passenger Protection Act, or a comparable violation of an ordinance of a unit of local government, as specified in Supreme Court Rule 551, and if the accused does not appear in court on the date set for appearance or any date to which the case may be continued and the court issues an arrest warrant for the accused, based upon his or her failure to appear when having so previously been ordered to appear by the court, the accused upon his or her admission to bail shall be assessed by the court a penalty of $100. Provides that the penalty shall be in addition to any bail that the accused is required to deposit for the offense for which the accused has been charged and may not be used for the payment of court costs or fines assessed for the offense. Provides that the clerk of the court shall remit $95 of the penalty assessed to the arresting agency who brings the offender in on the arrest warrant. Provides that the clerk of the court shall remit $5 of the penalty assessed to the Circuit Court Clerk Operation and Administrative Fund.
Title
CRIM PRO-FAIL TO APPEAR
Sponsors
Rep. Franco Coladipietro [R] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-20 | First Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2010-03-25 | Judicial Note Filed from the Supreme Court of Illinois, Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts. | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-17 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 005-001-000 | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2010-02-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2010-02-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2010-02-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2010-02-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |