IL HB6135 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Property Tax Appeal Board for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2014, as follows: Other State Funds $5,034,200.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$PTAB FY15 OCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-03HouseSession Sine Die
2014-06-30HouseRule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2014-05-15HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2014-05-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-056-000
2014-05-15HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2014-05-15HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2014-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-14HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 009-005-000
2014-05-14HousePension Note Filed
2014-05-14HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2014-05-14HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2014-05-14HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2014-05-14HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2014-05-14HouseFiscal Note Filed
2014-05-13HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2014-04-02HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2014-04-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-04-01HouseFirst Reading
2014-04-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2014-04-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback