IL HB6105 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Volunteer Driver Protection Act. Provides that an insurer may not refuse to issue vehicle insurance to a person solely because the applicant is a volunteer driver and may not impose a surcharge or otherwise increase the rate for a vehicle policy solely on the basis that the named insured or any member of the insured's household or a person who customarily operates the insured's vehicle is a volunteer driver. Provides that the Act shall not prohibit an insurer from taking any actions upon factors other than the volunteer status of the insured driver. Provides that no producer of vehicle insurance may receive a license under the Illinois Insurance Code or any other professional regulation statute if the producer fails to certify under oath that the producer does not discriminate against volunteer drivers. Effective immediately.
Title
INS - VOLUNTEER DRIVER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-09 | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Insurance Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6105&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB6105.htm |