IL HB6074 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on November 30 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on November 30 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Decreases the duration from 7 years to 5 years for unclaimed property held by any federal, State, local government or governmental entity to be presumed abandoned.
Title
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] |
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-11-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-11-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2016-11-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-11-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2016-11-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-11-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-11-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2016-11-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 16, 2016 |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 1025 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1025 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |