IL HB6063 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-28 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Aging Committee
Pending: House Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-28 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Aging Committee
Pending: House Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. Provides that, in addition to other provisions, the Department on Aging shall increase the effectiveness of the existing Community Care Program by ensuring that the determination of need tool accurately reflects the service needs of individuals with Alzheimer's disease and related dementia disorders. Effective immediately.
Title
AGING-ALZHEIMER'S SRVC NEEDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Aging Committee | |
2010-12-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-12-28 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-12-01 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-12-01 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2010-12-01 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-12-01 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-12-01 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-12-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-12-01 | Arrived in House | |
2010-12-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2010-12-01 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 1, 2010 | |
2010-11-30 | Second Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000 | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-11-29 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2010-11-29 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-11-29 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2010-11-22 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-11-22 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-11-18 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 11, 2011 | |
2010-11-18 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-04-20 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-20 | First Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 | |
2010-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-03-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-03-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2010-03-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2010-03-26 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-03-26 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-03-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2010-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-25 | Do Pass / Short Debate Aging Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2010-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Aging Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |