IL HB6041 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0715
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that a petition to disconnect territory from a fire protection district that would cause serious injury to a fire protection district shall be dismissed. Defines serious injury. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE PROT DIST-SERIOUS INJURY
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0715 |
2016-08-05 | House | Effective Date August 5, 2016 |
2016-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 118-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-20 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 705 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |